RI H7442 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a moratorium on the creation of any new charter public schools until there is a revision in the school funding formula to better reflect ELL and special education services.
Title
Establishment Of Charter Public Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Jose Serodio [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/11/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7442.pdf |