RI H7432 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a new method to fund transportation and bridge costs in RI. The act would establish the RI transportation infrastructure fund as a restricted receipt account within the RI intermodal surface transportation fund
Title
Rhode Island Transportation Infrastructure Fund -- Creation -- Allocations To Fund
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Linda Finn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2014) |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7432.pdf |