RI H7427 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the division of vital records shall ensure the records are accessible to the local registrars and grant local registrars the authority to issue certified copies of certificates and records.
Title
Relating To Health And Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
Rep. Michelle McGaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7427.pdf |