RI H7427 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Officers And Employees - Longevity Payments (would Eliminate Longevity Payments For Any State Employee, Any Employees Of The Board Of Governors Of Higher Education, The Bre&se, The Ri Public Telec. Authority, & Of Quasi-public Corp., Not Provided For In A Collective Bargaining Agreement.)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Officers And Employees - Longevity Payments (would Eliminate Longevity Payments For Any State Employee, Any Employees Of The Board Of Governors Of Higher Education, The Bre&se, The Ri Public Telec. Authority, & Of Quasi-public Corp., Not Provided For In A Collective Bargaining Agreement.)
Sponsors
Rep. Roberto DaSilva [D] | Rep. Robert Flaherty [D] | Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. John Savage [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2012) | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7427.pdf |