RI H7425 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implement the federal Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act (SORNA) (Title I of Public Law 109-248)
Title
Sexual Offender Registration And Notification
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] |
Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |