RI H7417 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Holders of Class B licenses shall offer the public food during times alcoholic beverages are sold to the public.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-05-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-04-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-04-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-04-08 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |