RI H7405 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Born-Alive Infant Protection Act and provide for the duties and obligations of medical personnel in certain circumstances.
Title
Born-alive Infant Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7405.pdf |