RI H7405 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Rights Of Nursing Home Patients (would Require A Nursing Home To Reimburse Any Money That Has Been Prepaid By A Deceased Patient To The Nursing Home To The Estate Of The Deceased Patient Within Thirty Days Of The Date Of Death Of The Patient)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Rights Of Nursing Home Patients (would Require A Nursing Home To Reimburse Any Money That Has Been Prepaid By A Deceased Patient To The Nursing Home To The Estate Of The Deceased Patient Within Thirty Days Of The Date Of Death Of The Patient)
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Rice [?] | Rep. Michael Rice [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-09 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-02 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-02 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-19 | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services | |
2010-05-18 | House passed Sub A | |
2010-05-11 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-11 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-03 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7405.pdf |