RI H7397 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-12 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Making Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2011
Title
An Act Making Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-12 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-04 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-04 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-04 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-04 | Referred to Senate Finance | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled to be heard and /or considered in anticipation of House passage | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-03 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7397.pdf |