RI H7381 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- LEVY AND ASSESSMENT OF LOCAL TAXES - Places a cap of twenty percent (20%) on increases in consecutive revaluations of real property in all cities and towns conducting revaluations commencing December 31, 2024, and every December 31 thereafter.
Title
Places a cap of twenty percent (20%) on increases in consecutive revaluations of real property in all cities and towns conducting revaluations commencing December 31, 2024, and every December 31 thereafter.
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7381.pdf |