RI H7381 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/13/2020)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/13/2020)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an emergency management director emeritus license plate for Thomas F. Senerchia of West Warwick.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles--emergency Management Director Emeritus
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/13/2020) |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/06/2020) |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7381.pdf |