RI H7377 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- STATE BUILDING CODE -- RHODE ISLAND INCLUSIVE HOME DESIGN ACT - Establishes the Rhode Island Inclusive Home Design Act as a new article in the state building code.
Title
Establishes the Rhode Island Inclusive Home Design Act as a new article in the state building code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- STATE BUILDING CODE
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- STATE BUILDING CODE -- RHODE ISLAND INCLUSIVE HOME DESIGN ACT
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- STATE BUILDING CODE
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- STATE BUILDING CODE -- RHODE ISLAND INCLUSIVE HOME DESIGN ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7377.pdf |