RI H7369 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- MOTOR VEHICLE OFFENSES - Prohibits the division of motor vehicles from placing on a motorist's driving record, a traffic violation which fine has been paid no longer than thirty (30) days after its issuance. This procedure would only be utilized twice per year.
Title
Prohibits the division of motor vehicles from placing on a motorist's driving record, a traffic violation which fine has been paid no longer than thirty (30) days after its issuance. This procedure would only be utilized twice per year.
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2024) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7369.pdf |