RI H7364 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES - Caps amount payable for 30 day supply of equipment/supplies for insulin administration/glucose monitoring at $25 or equipment designed to last more than 30 days with no deductible commencing January 1, 2025.
Title
Caps amount payable for 30 day supply of equipment/supplies for insulin administration/glucose monitoring at $25 or equipment designed to last more than 30 days with no deductible commencing January 1, 2025.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2024) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7364.pdf |