RI H7361 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Commission To Make A Comprehensive Study And Provide Recommendations For Remedies To The Erosion Of Rhode Island Beaches (creates A 9 Member Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Remedies To The Erosion Of Ri Beaches, And Would Report Back By January 5, 2025 And Expire On March 5, 2025.)
Title
HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL COMMISSION TO MAKE A COMPREHENSIVE STUDY AND PROVIDE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR REMEDIES TO THE EROSION OF RHODE ISLAND BEACHES (Creates a 9 member commission to study and provide recommendations for remedies to the erosion of RI beaches, and would report back by January 5, 2025 and expire on March 5, 2025.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | House read and passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/09/2024) |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |