RI H7356 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits employees who are covered by employer-sponsored disability insurance programs to elect to be exempt from the state TDI program.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance - Contributions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2016) |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7356.pdf |