RI H7355 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Further delineates the definitions of felony, misdemeanor and petty misdemeanor.
Title
General Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2022) |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7355.pdf |