RI H7355 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Recognizing The Fetus As A Human Life Upon The Existence Of A Heartbeat
Title
House Resolution Recognizing The Fetus As A Human Life Upon The Existence Of A Heartbeat
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Jose Serodio [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2020) |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7355.pdf |