RI H7353 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting Rhode Island Energy In Conjunction With The Public Utilities Commission To Submit A Proposal For New, Multi-year Electric Vehicle Programming
Title
HOUSE RESOLUTION RESPECTFULLY REQUESTING RHODE ISLAND ENERGY IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION TO SUBMIT A PROPOSAL FOR NEW, MULTI-YEAR ELECTRIC VEHICLE PROGRAMMING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7353.pdf |