RI H7347 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the earned income tax credit from ten percent (10%) to twelve and one-half percent (12.5%) for tax year 2016 and to twenty percent (20%) for tax year 2017 and beyond.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7347.pdf |