RI H7336 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires carbon-emissions-reduction goals be considered in energy plant siting proceedings.
Title
Energy Facility Siting Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2022) |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7336.pdf |