RI H7335 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it illegal for any custodian of a child to engage in sexual penetration or sexual contact with any child under their supervision if said child is between the ages of fourteen (14) and eighteen (18).
Title
Sexual Assault
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7335.pdf |