RI H7330 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the definition of vote to accommodate the new computer voting machine, it authorizes the BOE to promulgate rules concerning the process by which irregular ballots with write-in candidates are maintained and changes how printout tapes are handled.
Title
Conduct Of Election/voting Equipment Suppliers
Sponsors
Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-06-08 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2016) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |