RI H7305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds alcohol and alcohol-related overdoses and possession or transportation of alcohol by an underage person, to the Good Samaritan Overdose Prevention Act.
Title
The Good Samaritan Overdose Prevention Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |