RI H7297 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS -- QUALIFICATIONS - Establishes a second avenue of qualification as an optician, to include successfully completing an apprenticeship program.
Title
Establishes a second avenue of qualification as an optician, to include successfully completing an apprenticeship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2024) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2024-04-04 | House | House read and passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/26/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2024) |
2024-02-12 | House | Meeting postponed (02/13/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Subjects
Businesses And Professions
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS -- QUALIFICATIONS
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- OPTICIANS -- QUALIFICATIONS