RI H7297 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensures parental access to information, materials or results to state assessments of students, including instructions, answer sheets and assessments. It prevents the collection of personally identifiable and personal data.
Title
Rhode Island Educational Records Bill Of Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2016) |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7297.pdf |