RI H7291 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- RHODE ISLAND EARLY CARE AND EDUCATION WORKFORCE DATA ACT - Codifies the previously funded Rhode Island early care and education workforce registry data system.
Title
Codifies the previously funded Rhode Island early care and education workforce registry data system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7291.pdf |