RI H7280 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of public works so that it would include any public works projects performed for any city or town or quasi-municipal entity and the state and any quasi-state entity.
Title
Labor And Payment Of Debts By Contractors
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7280.pdf |