RI H7277 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- SALES AND USE TAXES -- LIABILITY AND COMPUTATION - Exempts from the sales and use tax the sale of beer and malt beverages at retail.
Title
Exempts from the sales and use tax the sale of beer and malt beverages at retail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/02/2024) |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7277.pdf |