RI H7275 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require, prior to the award of authority, that all bidders for public works contracts provide a list of the subcontractors to be utilized
Title
Labor And Payment Of Debts By Contractors
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Michael Marcello [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2014) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7275.pdf |