RI H7274 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations - Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction And Enforcement (would Facilitate And Expedite A Fair, Efficient, And Swift Process To Resolve Matters Regarding Custody And Visitation When A Parent Receives Temporary Duty, Deployment, Or Mobilization Orders From The Military)
Title
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations - Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction And Enforcement (would Facilitate And Expedite A Fair, Efficient, And Swift Process To Resolve Matters Regarding Custody And Visitation When A Parent Receives Temporary Duty, Deployment, Or Mobilization Orders From The Military)
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Peter Martin [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-07 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2012-06-06 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/07/2012) | |
2012-06-06 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2012-05-29 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2012) | |
2012-05-29 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-25 | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2012) | |
2012-02-02 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2012) | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7274.pdf |