RI H7273 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- ACCIDENT AND SICKNESS INSURANCE POLICIES - Requires insurance coverage for all services provided by a pharmacist provided coverage of such services would have been covered if provided by a physician, advanced practice nurse, or physician assistant.
Title
Requires insurance coverage for all services provided by a pharmacist provided coverage of such services would have been covered if provided by a physician, advanced practice nurse, or physician assistant.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/01/2024) |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7273.pdf |