RI H7262 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables a married couple to have both their names listed as co-owners with right of survivorship on a certificate of title issued by the division of motor vehicles.
Title
Certificate Of Title
Sponsors
Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7262.pdf |