RI H7239 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sets aside the second Saturday in the month of April annually to be known as Historical Cemetery Restoration/Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Holidays And Days Of Special Observance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
2018-06-07HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/07/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-02-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
2018-01-19HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback