RI H7229 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs livestock advisory council to conduct public hearings on legislation involving safety/health/humane environment of livestock and present recommendations at all hearings conducted by any general assembly committee on the legislation.
Title
Livestock Welfare And Care Standards Advisory Council
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7229.pdf |