RI H7228 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes state-operated gaming at a facility located in the town of Tiverton, subject to voter approval.
Title
Authorizing State-operated Gaming At A Facility In Tiverton
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-03-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-03-02 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/02/2016) |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/01/2016) |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2016) |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |