RI H7212 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes tax increases on personal income, with the revenue collected therefrom to be deposited into restricted receipt accounts for the purposes of state aid to municipalities, and reimbursement of public school construction.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7212.pdf |