RI H7208 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY TAX RELIEF - Increases the income range up to fifty thousand dollars ($50,000) and tax credit up to eight hundred fifty dollars ($850), for elderly and disabled persons who own or rent their homes.
Title
Increases the income range up to fifty thousand dollars ($50,000) and tax credit up to eight hundred fifty dollars ($850), for elderly and disabled persons who own or rent their homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7208.pdf |