RI H7208 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that legislative grants be awarded by senators and representatives in equal prorated shares, one half (1/2) in each chamber.
Title
Budgeting - Legislative Grants
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018) |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7208.pdf |