RI H7200 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Opposing Weaver's Cove Energy Llc's Proposed Offshore Berth Project Along With The Lng Facility At Weaver's Cove, Fall River, Massachusetts And The Transportation Of Lng On Narragansett Bay And Mt. Hope Bay
Title
House Resolution Opposing Weaver's Cove Energy Llc's Proposed Offshore Berth Project Along With The Lng Facility At Weaver's Cove, Fall River, Massachusetts And The Transportation Of Lng On Narragansett Bay And Mt. Hope Bay
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas Gablinske [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. Helio Melo [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | House read and passed | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-09 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-04-15 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7200.pdf |