RI H7193 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows social gaming in private residences and in public taverns or private clubs as long as the gambling is incidental to a bona fide social relationship between the participants and no person other than the participants receive anything of value.
Title
Gambling And Lotteries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7193.pdf |