RI H7184 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes licensed school psychologists under the provisions of the general laws governing the regulations of psychologists and provides specific qualifications applicants for licensing as a school psychologist must meet.
Title
Psychologists
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2022) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7184.pdf |