RI H7180 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- OFFICE OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES - Requires the secretary of the executive office of health and human services to present to the general assembly a plan for the realignment of state hospitals into a department of hospitals no later than July 1, 2024.
Title
Requires the secretary of the executive office of health and human services to present to the general assembly a plan for the realignment of state hospitals into a department of hospitals no later than July 1, 2024.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Spears [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7180.pdf |