RI H7174 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends to the town of Coventry the provisions of ยง 44-7-10.2 relative to the non-issuance of building and demolition permits to applicants in arrears on taxes, liens, and assessments.
Title
Collection Of Taxes Generally--coventry
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7174.pdf |