RI H7161 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes fire districts to provide for an exemption, from fire taxes, for volunteer firefighters.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. John Lyle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2020) |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7161.pdf |