RI H7157 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the minimum wage to eleven dollars and fifty cents ($11.50) as of October 1, 2020.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-03-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/04/2020) |
2020-02-13 | House | House passed Sub A |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/13/2020) |
2020-02-11 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-02-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |