RI H7148 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the "lookback" period for third and subsequent offenses under the driving under the influence of liquor or drugs law (section 31-27-2) and the refusal to submit to a chemical test law (section 31-27-2.1) from five (5) years to ten (10) years.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2014) |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7148.pdf |