RI H7140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the state use the actual residences of persons in government custody for census and redistricting purposes.
Title
Residence Of Those In Government Custody Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2020) |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7140.pdf |