RI H7131 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an exemption to the access to public records law for winners of lottery prizes.
Title
Access To Public Records
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2020) |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7131.pdf |