RI H7125 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensively expands the registration of motor vehicle airbags to prohibit the manufacture and importation of substandard airbags and broaden the definition of airbags.
Title
Airbag Regulation
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-06-07 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2018) |
2018-05-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2018) |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |